Kingdom | Park | Dues Paid Until | Dues Paid On | Dues For Life? |
---|
Name | Type | Quit |
---|---|---|
Bellator Adamas | Company | × |
Darkjester, Harlequin | Household | × |
Note | Description | Date | × |
---|---|---|---|
IMD Defender to Duke Zumat | 2003-04-01 - 2003-08-01 | × | |
Baron of Inland Ocean | 2001-10-01 - 2002-04-01 | × | |
Champion of Inland Ocean | 2001-04-01 - 2001-10-01 | × | |
Champion of Greenwood Keep | 1999-09-01 - 2000-05-01 | × | |
Duke of IMD | 2003-08-01 - 2004-02-01 | × | |
Squire to Guy Kasama | 2003-08-04 | × | |
Bellator Adamas | 1969-12-31 | × |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dragon (Order of the Dragon) | 1999-01-01 | Baron Calidran Lightbane; | × | Strip | |||
Dragon (Order of the Dragon) | 2001-04-01 | Baron Caddigren Dentiata; | × | Strip | |||
Dragon (Order of the Dragon) | 2001-10-01 | Baron Medzek; | × | Strip | |||
Dragon (Order of the Dragon) | 2001-10-01 | Baron Medzek; | × | Strip | |||
Dragon (Order of the Dragon) | 2003-08-01 | Duke Zumat; | × | Strip | |||
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 1999-01-01 | Baron Calidran Lightbane; | × | Strip | |||
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 1999-01-01 | Baron Calidran Lightbane; | × | Strip | |||
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 2002-10-01 | Baron Downfall; | × | Strip | |||
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 2004-01-01 | Emperor Michael; | × | Strip | |||
Hydra (Order of the Hydra) | 2001-10-01 | Baron Medzek; | × | Strip | |||
Hydra (Order of the Hydra) | 2003-08-01 | Duke Zumat; | × | Strip | |||
Lion (Order of the Lion) | 2003-08-01 | Duke Zumat; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 1999-01-01 | Baron Calidran Lightbane; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2000-06-01 | Sheriff Trevor; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2002-08-01 | Baron Downfall; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2005-08-01 | Emperor Kord and Regent Talisin; | × | Strip | |||
Smith (Order of the Smith) | 2002-01-01 | Baroness Tryniti Dracona; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 1999-01-01 | Baron Calidran Lightbane; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 1999-01-01 | Baron Calidran Lightbane; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2000-01-01 | ; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2000-06-01 | ; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2001-10-01 | Baron Medzek; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2003-08-01 | Duke Zumat; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2004-01-01 | Emperor Michael; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2010-12-01 | Kota and Refeki; | × | Strip |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Squire | Guy Kasama | × | Strip |