Kingdom | Park | Dues Paid Until | Dues Paid On | Dues For Life? |
---|
Name | Type | Quit |
---|
Note | Description | Date | × |
---|---|---|---|
Lord | GV | 2002-08-01 | × |
Squire | Sir Leo | 2001-10-01 | × |
Regent | 2001-08-01 - 2002-02-01 | × | |
Champion | 2002-08-01 - 2003-02-01 | × | |
Order of the Ambassador, given by: Ignus, 2001 | 2003-08-04 | × | |
Argent Helm | 1969-12-31 | × |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dragon (Order of the Dragon) | 2002-05-01 | Squire Balthor; | × | Strip | |||
Dragon (Order of the Dragon) | 2004-02-01 | Page Thalese; | × | Strip | |||
Flame (Order of the Flame) | 2002-07-01 | Squire Balthor; | × | Strip | |||
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 2004-11-01 | Duke Alverez; | × | Strip | |||
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 2005-11-01 | Duke Magnus Blackeagle; More stuff | × | Strip | |||
Hydra (Order of the Hydra) | 2004-02-01 | Page Ce'Dar; | × | Strip | |||
Jovious (Order of the Jovius) | 2000-07-01 | October Cordell; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2002-08-01 | Squire Balthor; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2003-11-01 | Page Thalese; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2001-08-01 | Ignus; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2002-01-01 | Sir Sanchez; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2003-02-01 | Squire Balthor; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2003-11-01 | MaA SnowStalker; | × | Strip |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|