Kingdom | Park | Dues Paid Until | Dues Paid On | Dues For Life? |
---|
Name | Type | Quit |
---|---|---|
Heralds of the Apocalypse | Company | × |
Jorc 2.0 forever infinity unleashed: live on broadway | Household | × |
Tzhazhgath urwa k'a thkurra kazka | Company | × |
Note | Description | Date | × |
---|---|---|---|
Master | King Sir Firespitter, BL | 2008-08-01 | × |
Champion, Veles Harbour | 2008-05-01 - 2008-10-01 | × | |
Captain of the Guard | 2008-11-01 - 2009-04-01 | × | |
Chancellor, Harbour of Rhye | 2009-02-01 - 2009-08-01 | × | |
GM Wizards CG-HoR | 2013-04-01 - 2013-06-01 | × | |
ProTem Champion,Helstroms Hollow | 2013-03-01 - 2013-07-01 | × |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 2013-04-01 | Sheriff Garret Thornwood CG-HoR; | × | Strip | |||
Lion (Order of the Lion) | 2013-03-01 | Sheriff Antonius Aequitas; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2008-05-01 | Renn Penombra; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2009-05-01 | Lord Renn; | × | Strip | |||
Smith (Order of the Smith) | 2009-05-01 | Lord Renn; | × | Strip | |||
Smith (Order of the Smith) | 2013-03-01 | Sheriff Antonius Aequitas; For Fighter practices | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2009-05-01 | Lord Renn; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2013-04-01 | Sheriff Garret Thornwood CG-HoR; | × | Strip |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|