Kingdom | Park | Dues Paid Until | Dues Paid On | Dues For Life? |
---|
Name | Type | Quit |
---|---|---|
House Fukkit | Household | × |
Note | Description | Date | × |
---|---|---|---|
Ducal Prime Minister | 2003-10-01 - 2004-03-01 | × | |
Man At Arms to Squire Totem Kyan | 2003-09-22 | × | |
1st Ain't Done Dick given by Monarch Crykit April 2005 | 2005-05-14 | × | |
House of the Bloodwolves | 1969-12-31 | × | |
Fighting Company Chaos Leagions Inc. | 1969-12-31 | × |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Order of the Dragon | 1 | 2002-06-01 | Dame Marquis Totem Kyan | Darkmoon, The Empire of the Iron Mountains | × | Strip | |
Order of the Lion | 1 | 2003-07-01 | Sylvan | Darkmoon, The Empire of the Iron Mountains | × | Strip | |
Order of the Owl | 1 | 2004-03-01 | Temujin von Raven Kyan | Darkmoon, The Empire of the Iron Mountains | × | Strip | |
Order of the Rose | 1 | 2002-04-01 | Dame Marquis Totem Kyan | Darkmoon, The Empire of the Iron Mountains | × | Strip | |
Order of the Rose | 2 | 2003-08-01 | Michael, Hammer of God | The Empire of the Iron Mountains | × | Strip | |
Order of the Warrior | 1 | 2002-04-01 | Dame Marquis Totem Kyan | Darkmoon, The Empire of the Iron Mountains | × | Strip | |
Order of the Warrior | 2 | 2003-04-01 | Sylvan | Darkmoon, The Empire of the Iron Mountains | × | Strip |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|