Kingdom | Park | Dues Paid Until | Dues Paid On | Dues For Life? |
---|
Note | Description | Date | × |
---|---|---|---|
Lord | Queen Squire Squire, Queen of Neverwinter | 2008-08-01 | × |
Regent of Mystik Caverns | 2008-01-01 - 2008-06-01 | × | |
Pro-Term Sheriff of Mystik Caverns | 2008-02-01 - 2008-06-01 | × | |
Regent of Mystik Caverns | 2009-02-01 - 2009-11-01 | × | |
Regent of Mystik Caverns | 2009-10-01 - 2010-04-01 | × | |
Chancellor of Mystic Caverns | 2011-09-01 - 2012-02-01 | × | |
Horsemen | 1969-12-31 | × |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dragon (Order of the Dragon) | 2012-01-01 | Moonbay; | × | Strip | |||
Lion (Order of the Lion) | 2007-10-01 | Lady Layla Amunet-Sheriff of Mystik Caverns; For donating his personal and self made armory for raffle | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2007-10-01 | Lady Layla Amunet-Sheriff of Mystik Caverns; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2012-01-01 | Moonbay; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2007-10-01 | Lady Layla Amunet-Sheriff of Mystik Caverns; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2013-05-01 | Dash Amunet; | × | Strip |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|