Kingdom | Park | Dues Paid Until | Dues Paid On | Dues For Life? |
---|
Name | Type | Quit |
---|---|---|
shadow's and mask's | Company | × |
Siegeweapon Saints | Household | × |
Note | Description | Date | × |
---|---|---|---|
Guild master of Reeves | 2008-05-01 - 2008-11-01 | × | |
Champion of the Duchy of Olympus | 2011-05-01 - 2011-10-01 | × | |
Member of the Seige weapon Saints | 2007-09-01 | × |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Flame (Order of the Flame) | 2012-11-01 | Duchy of Querna Tema; Given to Free Companies for Summer Trials X | × | Strip | |||
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 2007-04-01 | Duke Wolfstar; | × | Strip | |||
Gryphon (Order of the Griffin) | 2011-04-01 | Duke Owen and Regent Wolfstar; | × | Strip | |||
Lion (Order of the Lion) | 2007-08-01 | Duke Covus; For Thwarting Arthons attempt to crash the Rakis Gate | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2007-05-01 | Duke Covus and Regent Lady Isabella Crawford; Services at SKBC | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2007-08-01 | Prince Jalea Strongbow; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2009-10-01 | Duchess Isabella - Olympus; | × | Strip | |||
Rose (Order of the Rose) | 2011-04-01 | Duke Owen and Regent Wolfstar; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2007-08-01 | Duke Covus; | × | Strip | |||
Warrior (Order of the Warrior) | 2009-10-01 | Duchess Isabella - Olympus; | × | Strip |
Award | Rank | Date | Given By | Given At | Note | × | Strip |
---|